Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gerosabren Corp Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Katz, Michael I., against Broude, Susan, Broude, Catherine, Broude, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions25 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3390 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/20/2013. | |
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Satisfied) filed by Gerosabren Corp Inc on 10/08/2009. | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Application - Other (and Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession) filed by Gerosabren Corp Inc on 09/22/2009. | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment for Gerosabren Corp Inc against Broude, Anthony ;Broude, Catherine ;Broude, Susan in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 09/22/2009. | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Catherine Broude occupant) filed by Gerosabren Corp Inc on 09/22/2009. | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Broude, Anthony; Broude, SusanBroude, Catherine on Complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.