Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gomez, Rosa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schurmer, Earl S., against Matzen, Luz Maria, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2009 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions178 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time3033 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
April 05, 2010 | file dismissal on complaint pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement | ||
March 08, 2010 | |||
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385 - file dismissal on complaint pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement scheduled for 04/05/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gomez, Rosa on 02/22/2010. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385 - file dismissal on complaint pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement scheduled for 04/05/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement (unconditional) filed by Gomez, Rosa on 02/09/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.