Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Surfside Iii Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moore, Pamela Abbott, against Weaver, Michael C, Weaver, Anne M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2009 |
CategoryContract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2064 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Surfside III Homeowners Association on 10/15/2009. | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved (Declaration of Non Service) filed by Surfside III Homeowners Association on 09/25/2009. | |
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved (Declaration of Non Service) filed by Surfside III Homeowners Association on 09/11/2009. | |
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved (Declaration of non service) filed by Surfside III Homeowners Association on 09/11/2009. | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Surfside III Homeowners Association on 08/28/2009. Filed By: Surfside III Homeowners Association(Plaintiff) Refers To: Weaver, Michael(Defendant) | Weaver, Anne(Defendant) | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Surfside III Homeowners Association on 08/28/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.