Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Snyder, David B., against Jue, Timothy E, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2173 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. on 10/13/2009. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved Jane Doe cauc female 40yrs old 5'6 tall 140 lbs) filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. on 08/11/2009. | |
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department S3. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.