Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Davis, Shedrick O, against Keller, Denise L, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2121 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 10, 2010 | no appearance needed if declaration is filed as to the status of the bankruptcy | ||
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 09/02/2009. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | CMC: Bankruptcy Removal - no appearance needed if declaration is filed as to the status of the bankruptcy scheduled for 02/10/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 08/25/2009. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | CMC: Bankruptcy Removal - no appearance needed if declaration is filed as to the status of the bankruptcy scheduled for 02/10/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing (Bankruptcy Case No 913239) filed by Keller, Denise L on 08/17/2009. | |
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 42. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.