Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Victor S, against Antkers, Tina-Marie, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Case file was destroyed on . | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
March 04, 2010 | |||
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 03/04/2010 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 02/18/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.