Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donahue Schriber Realty Group Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Park, Ernie Zachary, against Barzman, Roberta, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions28 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3449 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/20/2013. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (fully satisfied) filed by Donahue Schriber Realty Group LP on 08/25/2009. | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment for Donahue Schriber Realty Group LP against Barzman, Roberta in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/28/2009. | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Donahue Schriber Realty Group LP on 07/28/2009. | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1 through 10) filed by Donahue Schriber Realty Group LP on 07/28/2009. | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (to Pay or Quit & Declaration of Service) filed by Donahue Schriber Realty Group LP on 07/28/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.