Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Professional Collection Consultants, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wu, Scott D, against Colville, Holly, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time479 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 10/21/2010. | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially satisfied) filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 09/02/2010. | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 09/21/2009. | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (under CCP 1033B re Letter Advising of Superior Court Filing) filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 09/08/2009. | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (re Attorney Fees) filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 09/08/2009. | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (re Accrued Interest) filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 09/08/2009. | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Colville, Holly on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.