Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Farmer, Rita, Soltau, Candis, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 12, 2009 |
CategoryTrust Proceedings |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3338 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order (Approving The Order of the Kubovec Family Trust...etc.) filed by Harriger, David M on 04/21/2022. | |
April 20, 2022 | Petition for Confirmation and Acknowledgment by the COurt that Two Beneficiaries Have Graduated From... | ||
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Other (for Confirmation and Acknowledgment by Court That Two Beneficiaries Have Graduated From College an are Eligible to Receive the Trust Principal of their Trust; etc..) filed by Harriger, David M on 04/20/2022. | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition Other (PR) heard 04/20/2022 09:00:00 AM. | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (Thomas E. Olson as attorney) filed by Soltau, Candis on 04/14/2022. | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection (to Petition for Approval of Transfer of Educational Subtrust for Glenn Delaney to the Beneficiaries of the Kubovec Family Trust: etc..) filed by Soltau, Candis on 04/14/2022. | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (04/20/22) filed by Harriger, David M on 03/04/2022. | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Other (PR) - Petition for Confirmation and Acknowledgment by the COurt that Two Beneficiaries Have Graduated From College, etc.. scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - Other (for Confirmation and Acknowledgment by the COurt that Two Beneficiaries Have Graduated From College, etc..) filed by Harriger, David M on 03/02/2022. Filed By: Harriger, David M(Trustee) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.