Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dbre Moorpark Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evans, Chris J, against Haggard, Shain, Haggard, Michele, Dysart, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Exhibits destroyed. | |
July 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 07/28/2013. | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment for DBRE Moorpark LLC against Dysart, Nicholas ;Haggard, Michele ;Haggard, Shain in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 425.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 975.00 attorney fees entered on 11/03/2009. | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - without hearing filed by DBRE Moorpark LLC on 11/03/2009. | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court finding. | |
September 28, 2009 | Civil-Money |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.