Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citibank South Dakota, N.A., filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Valdez, Gretel L, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions417 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
May 26, 2010 | re:filing formal judgment | ||
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - re:filing formal judgment scheduled for 05/26/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Citibank South Dakota, N.A. on 05/24/2010. | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - re:filing formal judgment scheduled for 05/26/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
November 05, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Alleged $13,269.92 unpaid credit card complaint. Most of the debt was for cash at gambling locales. Grant motion for SJ. Enter J as prayed. gmr
Judge: Glen Reiser |
|
November 05, 2009 | |||
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | The motion is granted . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.