Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Lawson, Chelsea, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2288 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Capital One Bank USA NA rejected on 11/09/2009. | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 05/22/2009. | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 43. | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 12/31/2008. | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 12/31/2008. Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lawson, Chelsea(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 12/31/2008. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.