Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Macdowell, Todd A., against Bohana, Donna M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1674 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | The court orders the entire action dismissed without prejudice. -At the request of plaintiff's counsel | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication heard 04/06/2009 08:30:00 AM. | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
April 06, 2009 | File Proof of Service on Complaint of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC as to Defendant DOnna M Bohana | ||
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC on 04/02/2009. | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - File Proof of Service on Complaint of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC as to Defendant DOnna M Bohana scheduled for 04/06/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.