Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee Of Bank Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Vandyk, Yvonne S, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions135 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2318 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/24/2012. | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 05/15/2009. | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department S3. | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 12/31/2008. Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Assignee of Bank of America(Plaintiff) Refers To: Vandyk, Yvonne(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.