Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Ortega, Xochitl, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions93 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2533 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Fully Satisfied) filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 12/08/2015. | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Satisfied) filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 04/30/2015. | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 07/28/2014. | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 120.00 Credit 679.68 Interest 1483.20) filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 06/16/2014. | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Returned with Partial Satisfaction) filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 06/14/2013. | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 10/29/2012. | |
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 09/26/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.