Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Beyer, Christopher, against Borrego, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions419 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2250 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
March 19, 2010 | |||
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 03/19/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 02/22/2010. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 03/19/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 02/10/2009. | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 42. | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 12/30/2008. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.