Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Easy Loan Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Myers, Howard D., against Anderson, Shannon D, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2229 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order that Copy be Accepted in Lieu of Original Document filed by Easy Loan Corporation on 06/11/2009. | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Easy Loan Corporation on 06/11/2009. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Anderson, Shannon D on Complaint. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Easy Loan Corporation on 04/28/2009. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Clerks Judgment) filed by Easy Loan Corporation on 04/28/2009. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Easy Loan Corporation on 04/28/2009. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Easy Loan Corporation on 04/28/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.