Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Cynthia L, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Brown, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
January 16, 2009 | |||
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution. | |
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution. | |
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | The court orders the entire action dismissed without prejudice. Lack of Prosecution | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Req for Orders to Stop Harassment, Ntc of Hearing) filed by Gonzalez, Cynthia L on 01/02/2009. | |
December 31, 2008 | |||
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) - scheduled for 01/16/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Gonzalez, Cynthia L on 12/31/2008. | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) filed by Gonzalez, Cynthia L on 12/31/2008. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.