Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Saucedo, Jose Leonel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ewing, Michael, Best In The West Used Cars And Trucks, A Business Entity, Form Unknown, Michael Ewing, Estate Of Decedent Beverly Ann Noel, represented by Slack, Chad M., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions168 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time2240 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012. | |
July 31, 2008 | File Dismissal on Complaint of Saucedo pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement | ||
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385 - File Dismissal on Complaint of Saucedo pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement scheduled for 07/31/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Saucedo, Jose Leonel on 06/16/2008. | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385 - File Dismissal on Complaint of Saucedo pursuant to Notice of Unconditional Settlement scheduled for 07/31/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.