Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Allstate Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Morse, Michael S, against Ordaz, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time2704 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 02/11/2008. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint ($7,612.32 plus attorney fees, costs, and interest.) filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. Filed By: Allstate Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ordaz, Patricia(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.