Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Allstate Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morse, Michael S, against Lee Construction Company, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2704 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 02/20/2008. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint ($5,894.74 plus attorney fees, costs, and interest.) filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. Filed By: Allstate Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lee Construction Company(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet filed by Allstate Insurance Company on 12/31/2007. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.