Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mercury Casualty Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Laurie, John D, against Gutierrez, Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time4192 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 02/10/2012. | |
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY on 06/04/2010. | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (partial) filed by MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY on 08/06/2008. | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - Default - without hearing filed by MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY on 05/05/2008. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.