Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mercury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Laurie, John D, against Roes 1 Through 20, Charette, Craig, Charette, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time2594 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012. | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM) heard 07/31/2008 01:30:00 PM. | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | The Court orders Cross-Complaint against Roes 1 through 20 be dismissed without prejudice. | |
July 31, 2008 | Re Dismissal failure to identify & file proof of service on cross complaint of Charette | ||
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM) - Re Dismissal failure to identify & file proof of service on cross complaint of Charette scheduled for 07/31/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.