Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Weiswasser, David, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Beam, Gregory B, against Kinsley, Linda, Gibson, Jeff, Gibson, Bonnie, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Paul W. Baelly presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4316 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time4316 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | re: disposition of complaint | ||
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Motion to Dismiss (CCP 583.360) heard 10/22/2019 08:15:00 AM. | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss (CCP 583.360) - re: disposition of complaint scheduled for 10/22/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.