Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schaefer, Ronald filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time1470 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Ck#56200001003 issued in the amount of $165.00 on 12/7/11. Issued to Ronald Schaeffer. DP#1904159119 | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Amended Order (Declaration of Robert P Wright re Amended Order Settling First and Final Account) filed by Schaefer, Ronald on 11/29/2011. | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Supporting Declaration and Amended Order Settling First and Final Account and Report of Executor, etc., forwarded to Judge for approval/signature | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Order for Final Discharge filed by Schaefer, Ronald on 01/04/2010. | |
August 26, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing Date: August 26, 2009 If it is your intention to submit on the tentative decision, all that is required is that you submit a telefax to Judge Kellegrew's secretary, Mariela Murillo, at 805.981...
Judge: Kent Kellegrew |
|
August 26, 2009 | |||
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Final Distribution heard 08/26/2009 09:00:00 AM. | |
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Settling First and Final Acct, Report, Fees and Final Distribution) filed by Schaefer, Ronald on 08/26/2009. | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (August 26, 2009) filed by Schaefer, Ronald on 08/12/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.