Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Madsen, Dan W, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions207 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2668 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/24/2012. | |
July 31, 2008 | |||
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 07/31/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by CITIBANK ( SOUTH DAKOTA) N. A. on 07/22/2008. | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.