Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Collection, L.L.C., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rose, Calvin S., against Higa, Eric, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2668 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012. | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C. on 04/03/2008. | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved filed by PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C. on 02/27/2008. | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (re: Reduction of Filing Fees) filed by PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C. on 12/28/2007. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.