Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Patton, Jack T, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Olson, Thomas E., against Ream, Jodi Patton, Walter, Sally Patton, represented by Smith, Craig R., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Barbara A. Lane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Lane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2007 |
CategoryProbate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4124 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause (PR) - RE: Costs for Appellant regarding appeal per remittitur filed 03/02/23 scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing (PR) heard 03/08/2023 02:15:00 PM. | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Remittitur (Opinion or decision entered in the above-entitled cause on 12/05/22 and that this order, opinion or decision has now become final.) filed by the Ventura Superior Court on 03/02/2023 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance (of Hearing) filed by Patton, Jack T on 02/21/2023. | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Fax Request for Continuance and Order (GRANTED) filed by Patton, Jack T on 02/10/2023. | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference PR - Re: Completion of A/R by Special Master & Appelate Decision scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance (of Hearing) filed by Patton, Jack T on 01/23/2023. | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Fax Request for Continuance and Order (GRANTED) filed by Patton, Jack T on 01/17/2023. | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference PR - Re: Completion of A/R by Special Master & Appelate Decision scheduled for 02/15/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Opinion and Judgment (The Order dtd 9/20/18, & the Order dtd 10/10/18 are reversed. The Cross-Appeal is dismissed as moot. Costs to Appellant's) filed by the Ventura Superior Court on 12/05/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.