Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gucciardo, Jim, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lovretovich, Joseph M, against Martel, David, Harbor Freight Tools Usa Inc, Central Purchasing Llc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2007 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time4174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
January 07, 2008 | |||
December 31, 2007 | File Dismissal Re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement | ||
November 30, 2007 | OSC re failure to file proof of service or application and order for publication | ||
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gucciardo, Jim on 11/27/2007. | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 225 / 525 - File Dismissal Re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement scheduled for 12/31/2007 at 08:10:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 225 / 525 - File Dismissal Re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement scheduled for 12/31/2007 at 08:10:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.