Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Winnebago County, WI, . Winnebago County, WI Superior Courts with Bissett, Daniel J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2024 |
CategorySupport/Maintenance Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWinnebago County, WI |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Prop. order for support | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Interim financial summary to child supt agency | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion hearing
Judge: Krueger, Lisa M. |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of service | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of mailing | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for appearance
Judge: Krueger, Lisa M. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other
Judge: Krueger, Lisa M. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and petition | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of motion, motion | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.