Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Waukesha County, WI, . Waukesha County, WI Superior Courts with Aprahamian, Michael J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAprahamian, Michael J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2024 |
CategoryForeclosure Of Mortgage |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWaukesha County, WI |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Dismissed
Judge: Aprahamian, Michael J. |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for dismissal
Judge: Aprahamian, Michael J. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Prop. order for dismissal | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Lis pendens | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.