Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Abbasov, Ruslan, Umarova, Nargis, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Baltz, Jason Daniel, against Coleman, Lawshawn, represented by Schmaltz, Niabi, in the jurisdiction of Waukesha County, WI, . Waukesha County, WI Superior Courts with Herring, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationWaukesha County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion hearing
Judge: Maxwell, Michael P. |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Vacate judgment | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Declined | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of restitution
Judge: Paz, Monica |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Aff. noncompliance/prop. order for jdgmnt eviction | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.