Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lau, Andrea E filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Laue, Zackery Scott, Pogue, Taylor Jordyn, in the jurisdiction of Waukesha County, WI, . Waukesha County, WI Superior Courts with Dorow, Jennifer R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2023 |
CategoryPaternity Acknowledgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWaukesha County, WI |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Interim financial summary to child supt agency | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement/Stipulation - Before Trial
Judge: Bailey, Christopher |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Bailey, Christopher |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial conference
Judge: Bailey, Christopher |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Video conferencing | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Income and expense statement - respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.