Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Bank Of Chilton, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Duimstra, Robert Neil, against Bhatia, Annette, Bhatia, Harshinder P., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc., Lal, Monica L., Lal, Rashinder, (total of 9) See All represented by Mcneilly, James W., Jr., Murn, Donald J., in the jurisdiction of Waukesha County, WI, . Waukesha County, WI Superior Courts with Aprahamian, Michael J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWaukesha County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Aprahamian, Michael J. |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for judgment
Judge: Aprahamian, Michael J. |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default judgment
Judge: Aprahamian, Michael J. |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Prop. order for judgment | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Video conferencing | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion hearing
Judge: Aprahamian, Michael J. |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.