Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alfter, Kristine, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Deladurantey, Nathan Edward, against Lifelock, Inc., represented by Hayden, Christopher M., in the jurisdiction of Waukesha County, WI, . Waukesha County, WI Superior Courts with Carter, Lloyd V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarter, Lloyd V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWaukesha County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial
Judge: Carter, Lloyd V |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Prop. order for dismissal | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for dismissal
Judge: Carter, Lloyd V |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notes | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of assignment of judge | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judicial transfer
Judge: Carter, Lloyd V |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Domina, William J. |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and affirmative defense | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | eFiled Document Fee Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.