Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Metropolitan Group Property And Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) case represented by Hill, David Seth, against Kucan, Sarah R, in the jurisdiction of Waukesha County, WI, . Waukesha County, WI Superior Courts with Lazar, Maria S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLazar, Maria S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWaukesha County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | File destroyed | |
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | File Retained Electronically | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Certification of judgment | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for judgment/judgment
Judge: Lazar, Maria S. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment after motion
Judge: Lazar, Maria S. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket fee paid | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for default judgment | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of non-military service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.