Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sheboygan County, WI, . Sheboygan County, WI Superior Courts with Bastil, Samantha R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2024 |
CategoryFormal Proceedings |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSheboygan County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Claim against estate | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order setting time to hear petition
Judge: Duncan, Eric |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition for administration | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed order setting time to hear petition | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Special administration letters issued | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order appointing special administrator
Judge: Bastil, Samantha R. |
|
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of summary procedures deadline
Judge: Duncan, Eric |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed order appointing special administrator | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.