Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Shawano County, WI, . Shawano County, WI Superior Courts with Sloma, Katherine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2022 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationShawano County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Request | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Kussel, William F., Jr. |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation filed | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.