Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case against Leikam, Lucas, in the jurisdiction of Sawyer County, WI, . Sawyer County, WI Superior Courts with Yackel, John M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSawyer County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Warrant/Capias/Commitment canceled | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Respondents statement of possession of firearms | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant Civil Issued
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Firearm Surrender Hearing
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant Civil Authorized
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Injunction with firearm restriction
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Injunction granted
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.