Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Asp Scull, Teresa L filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Sawyer County, WI, . Sawyer County, WI Superior Courts with Yackel, John M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2017 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSawyer County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of mailing | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Scull, Lee A, Jr | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for support
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for support
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition granted
Judge: Yackel, John M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.