Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brockman, Adam Arnold filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Rusk County, WI, . Rusk County, WI Superior Courts with Anderson, Steven P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRusk County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Party app finding of fact/conclusion of law/jdgmnt | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Party app finding of fact/conclusion of law/jdgmnt | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notes | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Divorce Hearing
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Brockman, Adam Arnold | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Video conferencing
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.