Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anderson, Brent Mark filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Rusk County, WI, . Rusk County, WI Superior Courts with Anderson, Steven P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2018 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRusk County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Party app finding of fact/conclusion of law/jdgmnt | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition granted
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
|
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Party app finding of fact/conclusion of law/jdgmnt | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notes | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Divorce Hearing
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to appear
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Temporary order
Judge: Anderson, Steven P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.