Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Outagamie County, WI, . Outagamie County, WI Superior Courts with Schroeder, Mark G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchroeder, Mark G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2024 |
CategoryForeclosure Of Mortgage |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOutagamie County, WI |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Prop. order for judgment/prop. judgment | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of nonmilitary service | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of motion | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of motion, motion | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of service | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Lis pendens | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.