Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, WI, . Monroe County, WI Superior Courts with Radcliffe, Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRadcliffe, Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Suspension of drivers license for failure to pay
Judge: Radcliffe, Richard |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Radcliffe, Richard |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: Radcliffe, Richard |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Radcliffe, Richard |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.