Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, WI, . Monroe County, WI Superior Courts with Goodman, Mark L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGoodman, Mark L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Reinstate drivers license | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Suspension of drivers license for failure to pay
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.