Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Van Alstine, Christopher C. filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, WI, . Monroe County, WI Superior Courts with Goodman, Mark L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGoodman, Mark L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce/Annulment Worksheet | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings of facts/conclusions of law
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment after court trial
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Van Alstine, Christopher C. | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Qualified domestic relations order
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default divorce
Judge: Goodman, Mark L. |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Van Alstine, Christopher C. | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Van Alstine, Dawn J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.