Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Heiser, Sharolyn D, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Plier, Kyra K, against Boyea, Roberta L, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Hebl, Andrew Bryant, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, WI, . Monroe County, WI Superior Courts with Ziegler, Todd L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZiegler, Todd L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation/order of dismissal
Judge: Ziegler, Todd L |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial
Judge: Ziegler, Todd L |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | eFiled Document Fee Paid | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scheduling order
Judge: Ziegler, Todd L |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final pre-trial
Judge: Ziegler, Todd L |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury demand | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.