Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Wisconsin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Mcclellan, Heather M, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, WI, . Monroe County, WI Superior Courts with Ziegler, Todd L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZiegler, Todd L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2013 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of motion, motion | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for McClellan, Heather M | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notes | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Cragle, Branden | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic Filing Notice | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Converted to Electronic Filing | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.