Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hill, Kimberly Lenay filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Milwaukee County, WI, . Milwaukee County, WI Superior Courts with Sosnay, William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2020 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMilwaukee County, WI |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consolidated
Judge: Sosnay-08, William |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Converted to Electronic Filing | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Post adjudication action
Judge: Sosnay-08, William |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and order
Judge: Edwards, Lorenzo T., Jr. |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion hearing
Judge: Edwards, Lorenzo T., Jr. |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Berrios, Ana M. |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment
Judge: Kendrigan, Catherine |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Consolidate
Judge: Kendrigan, Catherine |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.