Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Marinette County, WI, . Marinette County, WI Superior Courts with Sequin, Jane M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMarinette County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for intox driver assessment and safety plan
Judge: Sequin, Jane M. |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment of conviction
Judge: Korpi, Lindsay |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status conference
Judge: Sequin, Jane M. |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Sequin, Jane M. |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Authorization | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of mailing | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Intake
Judge: Sequin, Jane M. |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury fee paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.